Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01115
Date Filed2023-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the total number of foreign nationals who have applied for humanitarian parole using the online CBP-One system since the program's inception in 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-211COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10017575) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for US Attorney, # 2 Summons for Defendant, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-21Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zrtw) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-213LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-05-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2023. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
2023-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/1/2023. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
2023-05-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 4/27/2023 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar