Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10018431) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the Dep't of Justice, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-24 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-04-24 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-04-25 | 3 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/25/23. (DM) (Entered: 04/25/2023) |
2023-06-15 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-06-16 | 5 | ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before July 7, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 16, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-06-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2023. (dot) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report by 9/11/2023. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/11/23. (DM) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-09-11 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file their next joint status report on or before November 10, 2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every sixty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 12, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every sixty days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-11-10 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/10/2023) |
2024-01-10 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-03-11 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Snyder, Cassandra) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |