Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Navy. Filing fee $402.00, receipt number TPA 68428 filed by Thomas Stalcup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Mailing Envelope)(AM) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 2 | SUMMONS issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Navy. (AM) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-26 | 3 | MOTION for Two Duces Tecum Issuance of Subpoena, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically ECF Electronic Filing Access by Thomas Stalcup. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document)(LSS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 04/27/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 4 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 5 | NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 6 | ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion for Issuance of Two Duces Tecum Subpoenas; granting 3 Motion for Leave to File Documents Electronically. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/8/2023. (EPW) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 7 | NOTICE of non-consent to magistrate judge; RETURN of service executed on 05/01/2023 by Thomas Stalcup as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service - FBI)(AG) Modified text on 5/12/2023 (AG). (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 8 | RETURN of service executed on 05/03/2023 by Thomas Stalcup as to United States Navy. (AG) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |