Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS Right to Know v. National Nuclear Security Administration
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2023cv00343
Date Filed2023-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa
PlaintiffUS Right to Know
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to National Nuclear Security Administration for records concerning intelligence finding or briefings by Lawrence Livermore National Lab related to the origin of COVID-19. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Nuclear Security Administration
DefendantU.S. Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-241COMPLAINT against National Nuclear Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (Dept. of Energy Correspondence), # 3 Exhibit C (NNSA Correspondence), # 4 Supplement FOIA (30-day) Summonses Requested, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-24United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-242PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-243Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8790446 re 1 COMPLAINT against National Nuclear Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (Dept. of Energy Correspondence), # 3 Exhibit C (NNSA Correspondence), # 4 Supplement FOIA (30-day) Summonses Requested, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) filed by US Right to Know (cmm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-274MOTION for Issuance of 30 Day (FOIA) Summonses by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Summons to NNSA, # 2 Supplement Proposed Summons to US Dept. of Energy, # 3 Supplement Proposed Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Supplement Proposed Summons to US Attorney, # 5 Supplement Correspondence with Clerk's Office) (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-255ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting 4 Motion for Issuance of 30-Day Summonses. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to issue the summonses attached to plaintiff's motion.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (lj) (Entered: 05/25/2023)
2023-05-26Summons Issued as to National Nuclear Security Administration, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 05/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar