Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRODIE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2023cv01568
Date Filed2023-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE
PlaintiffHOWARD BRODIE
Case DescriptionHoward Brodie, the owner and operator of the website Reducethebacklog.com, which aims to reduce the backlog of immigrant visas, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State. His first request asked for current and historical statistical information regarding the number of immigrant visa applications whose case are documentarily complete and pending interview scheduling. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Brodie sent a second FOIA request asking for information regarding the backlog of immigrant visa applications awaiting interviews and the difference in waiting times for consular officers to process non-immigrant visa applications compared to immigrant visa applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Brodie filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16647481.), filed by HOWARD BRODIE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form)(BUSTA, JULIE) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-252Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 4/25/23 (amas) (FILED IN ERROR) (va). (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-253Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel, US ATTY & US ATTY GEN on 4/25/23 (va) (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-05-054AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille Schoonmaker re: served Summons and Complaint upon Jacqueline C. Romero, U.S. Attorney by Certified U.S. Mail on 5/4/2023 (BUSTA, JULIE) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-055AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille Schoonmaker re: served Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Department of State by Certified U.S. Mail on 5/5/2023 (BUSTA, JULIE) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-056AFFIDAVIT of Service by Camille Schoonmaker re: served Summons and Complaint upon Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General by Certified U.S. Mail on 5/3/2023 (BUSTA, JULIE) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar