Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01148
Date Filed2023-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning allegations made by Sen. Charles Grassley pertaining to the alleged politicization of the FBI, particularly in the case of Timothy Thibault, an FBI agent who allegedly was punished for exercising his First Amendment rights. The Heritage Foundation also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10025557) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/26/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-26Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zljn) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-283NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander William Resar on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Resar, Alexander) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar