Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01150
Date Filed2023-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionProfessional Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to U.S. National Park Service for records concerning agency communications with Darrin Brawley and the Shannon County Sheriff's Office. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted PEER's request for a fee waiver. The agency told PEER that its request was complicated and would take a considerable amount of time to process. PEER volunteered to shorten the period of time for which it had requested records. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-251COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10025077) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for NPS, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-26Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zljn) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-284ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/28/23. (DM) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar