Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01161
Date Filed2023-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the use of Facebook's Content Request Government Reporting System by anyone working for the FBI. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records based on Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods or techniques). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of the denial. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the Cybersecurity and Information Security Agency, a component of the Department of Homeland Security also seeking records on whether anyone at that agency worked with the Facebook Content Request Government Reporting System. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. CISA asked Judicial Watch for a time frame for its request. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Division at DOJ for the same kinds of records about the Facebook system. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agencies concerning any of its requests, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10027956) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-273SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-274STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/27/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/10/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/9/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/10/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar