Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01163
Date Filed2023-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the FBI, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Judicial Watch asked the FBI for records concerning any meetings between the agency and named employees of Twitter from June 1, 2020 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. Judicial Watch asked the Department of Homeland Security for the same information about meetings with Twitter. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency took a 10-day extension. Judicial Watch asked ODNI for the same type of records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Judicial Watch for clarification. Judicial Watch provided clarification. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies relating to its requests, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10028097) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-273SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-274STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 27, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/10/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 5/10/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/9/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/10/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-306NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of All Defendants (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-307Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless): GRANTING the government's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING the government to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by June 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 31, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/19/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-158NOTICE of Appearance by Pardis Gheibi on behalf of All Defendants (Gheibi, Pardis) (Entered: 06/15/2023)
2023-06-209ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Gheibi, Pardis) (Entered: 06/20/2023)
2023-08-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, by August 4, 2023, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The parties have yet to file their Joint Meet and Confer Report, which was due on July 5, 2023, fourteen days after defendant filed its 9 Answer to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. See 5 Standing Order ¶ 4.b.ii. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/01/2023)
2023-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Show Cause due by 8/4/2023. (mac) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-0310RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2023)
2023-08-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISCHARGING, in light of plaintiff's 10 Response to August 1, 2023 Minute Order, the Court's August 1, 2023 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-2511Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by November 27, 2023, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 25, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2023 (mac) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-11-2712Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gheibi, Pardis) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-11-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, DIRECTING the parties to file, by February 26, 2024, another joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 28, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 2/26/2024 (mac) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2024-02-2613Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gheibi, Pardis) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
2024-02-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, DIRECTING the parties to file, by May 27, 2024, another joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 26, 2024. (lcbah4) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
2024-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2024 (mac) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
2024-05-2714Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gheibi, Pardis) (Entered: 05/27/2024)
2024-05-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, DIRECTING the parties to file, by August 25, 2024, another joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter, whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 29, 2024. (lcbah4) (Entered: 05/29/2024)
2024-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2024. (mac) (Entered: 05/30/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar