Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAMING v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01173
Date Filed2023-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILLIAM J. DAMING
Case DescriptionWilliam Daming submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning the suspension of his security clearance, first by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, where he had previously worked, and then by the Department of State, where he currently worked. As the result of the suspension of the security clearance, the State Department suspended him without pay. Daming submitted a FOIA to CBP for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but heard nothing further from the agency. Daming also submitted a FOIA request for records about himself from the State Department. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Daming filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
MATTHEW M. GRAVES
950 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
2255
ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
245 Murray Lane, S.W.
Washington, DC 20528
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantMATTHEW M. GRAVES United States Attorney for The District of Columbia
DefendantATTORNEY GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-271COMPLAINT WILLIAM DAMING against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10030360) filed by William Daming. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-28Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-04-282SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MATTHEW M. GRAVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-05-173RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/08/2023. (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/8/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/5/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-316NOTICE of Appearance by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-05-317Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/31/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-06-238ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 06/23/2023)
2023-06-23MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/23/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/23/2023)
2023-07-079Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 07/07/2023)
2023-07-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by August 14, 2023, including an estimated page count and processing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/11/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-08-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by October 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/16/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-10-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court hereby sets a status conference for November 2, 2023 at 10:00 AM by VTC before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Status Conference set for 11/2/2023 is vacated and reset for 11/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by VTC before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2023. (lsj) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-11-01Minute Entry for video Status Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2023. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) Modified on 11/1/2023 (lsj). (Entered: 11/01/2023)
2023-11-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by December 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/2/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-12-0112MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-0413Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by WILLIAM J. DAMING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Brett) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct event (zjm). (Entered: 12/04/2023)
2023-12-05MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their joint status report by December 8, 2023. The parties are directed to confer and resolve any outstanding disputes over the wording of the status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/5/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 12/08/2023)
2023-12-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by January 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/12/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2024-01-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by March 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/24/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/24/2024)
2024-03-21MINUTE ORDER: Seeing no response to the Court's January 24, 2024 Minute Order, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by March 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/21/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/21/2024)
2024-03-2816Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 03/28/2024)
2024-04-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by May 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/1/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/01/2024)
2024-05-2817Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 05/28/2024)
2024-05-30MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension. The parties shall file their joint status report by June 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/30/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/30/2024)
2024-06-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 06/04/2024)
2024-06-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by August 2, 2024, which shall include an estimated production schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/06/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar