Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01174
Date Filed2023-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, and the Federal Reserve. Its request to the Treasury Department asked for records concerning the systematic risk exception granted to Silicon Valley Bank. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Its request to the FDIC asked for the same types of records. The FDIC acknowledged receipt of the request. Its request to the Federal Reserve also asked for records on the systematic risk exception granted to SVB. The agency acknowledged that request as well. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantFEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
DefendantBOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10030505) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury, # 3 Summons Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, # 4 Summons Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrtw) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-273SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrtw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2023: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zrtw). (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-014ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/01/23. (DM) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-225NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Harold Kurtenbach on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Kurtenbach, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
2023-05-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/10/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM served on 5/10/2023; FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 5/08/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/10/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 5/24/2023 to add dates of service for defendants (zjm). (Entered: 05/23/2023)
2023-05-24NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to mbekesha@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Notice of Corrected Docket Entry: Your entry has been modified as a courtesy. Please note the appropriate reminders for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 3. Do Not Refile: Counsel reminded, when filing return of service: Do not use All Defendants radio button. Select individual party served and enter date of delivery for each. (zjm, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-06-057NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of All Defendants (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
2023-06-058ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
2023-06-089ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before July 5, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 7, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/08/2023)
2023-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2023. (dot) (Entered: 06/08/2023)
2023-07-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. In consideration thereof, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 6, 2023 and, if necessary, every ninety days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 5, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer to the Complaint 1 due by 7/10/2023. (dot) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2023 and, if necessary, every ninety days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-10-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2024-01-0412Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/04/2024)
2024-04-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 04/03/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar