Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRand v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Lauderdale
Case Number0:2023cv60789
Date Filed2023-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Roy K. Altman
PlaintiffMichael T. Rand
Case DescriptionMichael Rand submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the SEC for records concerning his conviction. He requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of his requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Rand filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation United States Department of Justice
DefendantExecutive Office of US Attorneys United States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-281COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Executive Office of US Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Michael T. Rand. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drz) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-04-282Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-05-013Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/28/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS268669. (vt) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-024ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 05/03/2023)
2023-05-025ORDER in Cases with Multiple Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 05/03/2023)
2023-05-086Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-237ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Michael T. Rand. (cqs) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar