Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369 v. United States Social Security Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv03595
Date Filed2023-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer H. Rearden
PlaintiffAmerican Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369
Case DescriptionThe American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369 submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning the issuance of an Executive Order during the Trump Administration related to parking spaces. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFGE, Local 3369 filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-281COMPLAINT against United States Social Security Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-27674258)Document filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369..(Armstrong, Laine) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-04-282CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Armstrong, Laine) (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-04-283FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Social Security Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369..(Armstrong, Laine) Modified on 5/1/2023 (vf). (Entered: 04/28/2023)
2023-05-01***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laine Alida Armstrong. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-01CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-01Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-01Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-01***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Laine Alida Armstrong to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. FOIA Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-014REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Social Security Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369..(Armstrong, Laine) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-025ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Social Security Administration. (vf) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-05-196AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against United States Social Security Administration.Document filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 3369. Related document: 1 Complaint..(Armstrong, Laine) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar