Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10036507) filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for the Office of Science and Technology Policy, # 4 Summons for the National Science Foundation, # 5 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-05-01 | | Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-05-01 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-05-02 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 2, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/02/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION served on 5/4/2023; OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY served on 5/12/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/12/2023. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-25 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/25/2023) |
2023-05-30 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by June 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 30, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Complaint due by 6/21/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-07-05 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Meet & Confer Statement, the parties to submit a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings by October 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 7, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 8 Joint Status Report, to file, by December 20, 2023, a joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 3, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2023 (mac) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sean Tepe (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2023-12-20 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 10 Joint Status Report, to file, by March 20, 2024, a joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 20, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2023-12-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2024 (mac) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |