Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01207
Date Filed2023-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning a memo from acting DEA Administrator Timothy Shear to the Deputy Attorney General titled Drug Enforcement Administration Request for Temporary Designation of Non-Title 21 Authority. The Cato Institute also requested expediting processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10037742) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-012NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-01Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/10/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/10/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-317Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 29, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/31/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar