Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01211
Date Filed2023-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the number of times CBP personnel were deployed to a state or locality for law enforcement operations involving public demonstrations absent a direct request for assistance from state or local officials. The Cato Institute also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-011COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10038561) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-012NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-05-023SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-05-124STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 12, 2023. (Brown, Erin) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 5/2/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/10/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/11/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-05-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
2023-06-019Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 1, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar