Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01247
Date Filed2023-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffKENNETH WHITE
Case DescriptionWilliam White, an immigration attorney, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, White filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10044558) filed by KENNETH WHITE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons Defendant DOS, # 4 Summons Summons USA DC, # 5 Summons Summons AG)(White, Kenneth) Modified on 5/3/2023 to correct docket text (rj). (Entered: 05/03/2023)
2023-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-193RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/8/2023 (White, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/08/2023. (White, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/8/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/7/2023. (White, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-06-066NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/06/2023)
2023-06-067Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar