Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Juan Lopez. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number BTXNDC-13711409) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements and Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Cover Sheet, # 3 Cover Sheet Supplement, # 4 Additional Page(s) Cert of Interested Parties) (Malik, Adam) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-03 | 2 | New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-03 | 3 | Summons issued as to Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (agc) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-03 | | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Juan Lopez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (See document 1 -4 for image) (axm) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-03 | 4 | Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (ykp) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-06-07 | 5 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 06/07/2023) |
2023-06-07 | 6 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 06/07/2023) |
2023-06-07 | 7 | NOTICE of Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements filed by Tae Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 06/07/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |
|