Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01262
Date Filed2023-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning Global Engagement Officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10046821) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F-2023-05435, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA F-2023-05440, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FOIA F-2023-05441, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons - State Department)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-303NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-304Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-315ORDER granting Motion 4 for Extension of Time to Respond. Response due by 07/07/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/31/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/7/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar