Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleABBAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01275
Date Filed2023-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffRIADH ABBAS
Case DescriptionRiadh Abbas submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Abbas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-041COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10048606) filed by RIADH ABBAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C., # 4 Summons Attorney General of the United States)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrtw) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-053MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kaitlyn T. Devenyns, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10049946. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RIADH ABBAS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration -Kaitlyn T. Devenyns, # 2 -Certificate of Good-Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-084STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 8, 2023. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Kaitlyn Devenyns may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 8, 2023. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-105NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Devenyns on behalf of RIADH ABBAS (Devenyns, Kaitlyn) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-06-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2023. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/23/2023 (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General -May 16, 2023. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-059NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of All Defendants (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar