Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01280
Date Filed2023-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability and Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for records concerning email correspondence between FDIC regulators in the immediate days surrounding the collapse of Silicon Valley Bank. GAO also asked for expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted GAO's request for expedited processing. The agency told GAO that its request fell within the unusual circumstances' exception. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-051COMPLAINT against FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION for Violations of the Freedom of Information Act ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10050053) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgement Letter), # 3 Exhibit C (Expedited Processing Granted), # 4 Exhibit D (Claim of Unusual Circumstances), # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Proposed to USAO, USAG, and FDIC)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-052NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsl) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-054STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/5/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-06-015ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION.(Benton, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2023)
2023-06-02MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before July 14, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on July 21, 2023, at 2:30 p.m., via Zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/2/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 06/02/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar