Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLwin et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2023cv01204
Date Filed2023-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard D. Bennett
PlaintiffYe Lwin
PlaintiffLouise Trauma Center LLC
PlaintiffThone Maung
Case DescriptionYe Lwin and the Louise Trauma Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning for a copy of the most current version of the Affirmative Asylum Procedures Manual. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lwin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-081COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10584344.), filed by YE LWIN.(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-082NOTICE by YE LWIN re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-083Consent to Magistrate Judge (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-084Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08Deficiency Notice -Louise Trauma Center LLC- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/15/2023 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-085Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Louise Trauma Center LLC (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-116AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons served on US Attorney on May 10, 2023, filed by Ye Lwin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-127SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ye Lwin. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/10/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-128SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ye Lwin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-129SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ye Lwin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar