Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZACHOR LEGAL INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01295
Date Filed2023-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffZACHOR LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionZachor Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning a contract between Qatar Foundation and the redacted entity referenced in a specified report from the Department of Education. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Zachor Legal Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10053179) filed by ZACHOR LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Education, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ZACHOR LEGAL INSTITUTE (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-154STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 15, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/10/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/9/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/16/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/15/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar