Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWELSH v. BLINKEN
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01299
Date Filed2023-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJASON WELSH
Case DescriptionJason Welsh, a State Department employee working in the Philippines, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning his request for an extension of his tour. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Welsh to provide authentication of his identity. Welsh provided an authentication form, but the agency denied his request because he did not provide the proper identification form. Welsh then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANTONY J. BLINKEN Secretary
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-081COMPLAINT against ANTONY J. BLINKEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10053732) filed by JASON WELSH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Wilkenfeld, Ari) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-10Case Assigned to Beryl A. Howell. (zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY J. BLINKEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-103STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 10, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar