Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePDV HOLDING, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01304
Date Filed2023-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPDV HOLDING, INC.
Case DescriptionPDV Holding, Inc. submitted two FOIA requests to the Office of Foreign Assets Control at the Department of Treasury for records. The first request asked for records involving OFAC and the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware in connection with Crystallax v. Venezuela. The second request asked for records concerning a specified list of documents pertaining to OFAC and the District Court for the District of Delaware. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PDV Holdings filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-081COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10054762) filed by PDV HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Summons to US Attorney General, # 8 Summons to US Dept. of Treasury - Civil Process Clerk, # 9 Summons to US Dept. of Treasury, # 10 Summons to US Attorney D.C., # 11 Summons to US Attorney General - OFAC, # 12 Summons to Civil Process Clerk - OFAC, # 13 Summons to Office of Foreign Asset Control, # 14 Summons to US Attorney D.C. - OFAC)(Hall, Samuel) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PDV HOLDING, INC. (Hall, Samuel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/9/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrtw) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar