Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew Mexico Cattle Growers Association v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2023cv00396
Date Filed2023-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar
PlaintiffNew Mexico Cattle Growers Association
Case DescriptionThe New Mexico Cattle Growers Association submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning aerial gunning of livestock in the Gila National Forest and Gila Wilderness on or about February 14, 2022. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NMCGA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture
DefendantUnited States Forest Service
DefendantUnited States Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Jensen, Brandon) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8814510 re 1 Complaint filed by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jensen, Brandon) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (bc) Modified on 5/9/2023 (bc). (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-082PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-083ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff New Mexico Cattle Growers Association by Brandon L. Jensen on behalf of: Karen Budd-Falen Budd Falen Law Offices 300 East 18th Street Cheyenne, WY 82003 3076325105 karen@buddfalen.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Jensen, Brandon) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-08Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8814609 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jensen, Brandon) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-084NOTICE by New Mexico Cattle Growers Association re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Jensen, Brandon) (Entered: 05/08/2023)
2023-05-09Summons Issued as to United States Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bc) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-19Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (jg) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-19Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar