Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01315
Date Filed2023-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionAmerican Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records from January 2018 to October 2021 that contain the microchip number of each wild horse or wild burro and the corresponding freeze mark number of ID number of each wild horse or wild burro that has a microchip number in the Bureau of Management's Wild Horse & Burro Program System database. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked AWHC to modify the scope of its request. AWHC did so. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-091COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10057863) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (x 3))(Stotter, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/10/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrtw) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-113STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/11/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar