Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJOHNSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01318
Date Filed2023-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffALLAN G. JOHNSON
Case DescriptionAllan Johnson submitted FOIA requests to the Department Army for records concerning the Annual History Report for the U.S. Army in Europe for various calendar years. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but closed the requests and referred Johnson to the National Archives to obtain the records. Johnson filed administrative appeals for the denials but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ARMY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10056992) filed by ALLAN G. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-163ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/23. (DM) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar