Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe 2005 Robert Julien Family Delaware Dynasty Trust et al v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityWest Palm Beach
Case Number9:2023cv80756
Date Filed2023-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robin L. Rosenberg
PlaintiffThe 2005 Robert Julien Family Delaware Dynasty Trust
PlaintiffMarc Julien TRUSTEE
Case DescriptionThe 2005 Robert Julien Family Delaware Dynasty Trust submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the Trust's taxes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency ultimately withheld the records under a variety of exemptions. The Trust filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, The Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-091COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Internal Revenue Service. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number CFLSDC-16603145, filed by The 2005 Robert Julien Family Delaware Dynasty Trust, Marc Julien. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Marod, Edward) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-092Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-093Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (rbe) (Entered: 05/09/2023)
2023-05-174ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-175STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar