Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01328
Date Filed2023-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffWASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS
Case DescriptionWashington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs submitted 55 FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons over a period of 13 years without ever receiving a full response or notice of appeals rights. WLC finally filed suit alleging a policy and practice claim against the agency.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10059563) filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons on U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons on U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-103SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-114STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2023. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-125NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder on behalf of WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/12/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/11/2023. (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/19/23. (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar