Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01338
Date Filed2023-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning about people who were moved to home confinement under the authority of the CARES Act after December 25, 2021. The ACLU requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing. The ACLU filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy challenging the agency's denial of expedited processing. OIP upheld the agency's denial of expedited processing. The ACLU then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-101COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief (FOIA) against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10061306) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons - Bureau of Prisons, # 4 Summons - US Attorney General, # 5 Summons - United States Attorney)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (None) by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to aspitzer@acludc.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-113CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint,, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar