Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01348
Date Filed2023-05-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications of Secretary Xavier Becerra. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10064117) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request 2022-00270-FOIA-OS, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - HHS)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsl) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-152STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar