Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAli Gorginfar v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2023cv03608
Date Filed2023-05-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark C. Scarsi
PlaintiffAli Gorginfar
Case DescriptionAli Gorginfar submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a report in which he was investigated by the FBI. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Gorginfar to limit its scope to 150 pages. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gorginfar filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantDaniel Dean
DefendantSteven Sanchez
DefendantDoe 1 through 10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-111COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35296654 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ali Gorginfar. (Attorney Jonathon David Nicol added to party Ali Gorginfar(pty:pla))(Nicol, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-112CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ali Gorginfar. (Nicol, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-113Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Ali Gorginfar. (Nicol, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-124NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-125NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-126Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-127INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-12830 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Daniel Dean, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Steven Sanchez. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-159NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-1510CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Ali Gorginfar, (Nicol, Jonathon) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar