Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01397
Date Filed2023-05-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning communications between the Financial Stability Oversight Council and Silicon Valley Bank and/or Signature Bank. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Judicial Watch that it would no responsive records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal. Its appeal was denied by the agency. Judicial Watch then submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Financia Research for the same type of communications between OFR and the two banks. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10074584) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-17Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zljn) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zljn) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/17/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-184STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/18/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar