Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT filed by Gregory J Landis, CIG DEVELOPMENT LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20647362.(Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 2 | CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 3 | ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CIG DEVELOPMENT LLC, Gregory J Landis, aviation services llc by Nicolette Glazer (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-30 | | SUMMONS Issued as to Small Business Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (sxh, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-07-05 | 4 | DESIGNATION of Abraham Judson Souza as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Small Business Administration (Souza, Abraham) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-05 | 5 | MOTION by Defendant Small Business Administration for extension of time to file responsive pleading (UNOPPOSED) (Souza, Abraham) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 6 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading 5 is granted. Defendant, Small Business Administration, to answer or otherwise respond to complaint through and including August 9, 2023. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-08-01 | 7 | MOTION by Defendant Small Business Administration for extension of time to file responsive pleading (UNOPPOSED) (Souza, Abraham) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-02 | 8 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's Unopposed Motion For Second Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading 7 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before September 8, 2023. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-09-06 | 9 | MOTION by Defendant Small Business Administration for extension of time to file responsive pleading (AGREED) (Souza, Abraham) (Entered: 09/06/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 10 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's agreed motion for third extension of time to file responsive pleading 9 is granted. Defendant is granted an extension to file a responsive pleading through and including October 10, 2023. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |