Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCohen v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2023cv00913
Date Filed2023-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge William Q. Hayes
PlaintiffJonathan Cohen
Case DescriptionJonathan Cohen submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cohen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-181COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 145671.), filed by Jonathan Cohen. Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt) The new case number is 3:23-cv-913-WQH-JLB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Cohen, Jonathan)(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-182Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-06-053PROOF OF SERVICE by Jonathan Cohen (alns) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
2023-06-204AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration, filed by Jonathan Cohen. (cxl1) (Entered: 06/20/2023)
2023-06-215**DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER 7 NOTICE** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint, by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen)Attorney Glen Dorgan added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft) (cxl1). Modified to withdraw on 6/22/2023 (cxl1). (Entered: 06/21/2023)
2023-06-216Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint, by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen) (cxl1). (Entered: 06/21/2023)
2023-06-227NOTICE of Withdrawal of Documents 5, 5-1, 5-2 from the Clerk's Record by Federal Aviation Administration (Dorgan, Glen) (cxl1). (Entered: 06/22/2023)
2023-06-228CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Amended Complaint by Jonathan Cohen (cxl1) (Entered: 06/22/2023)
2023-06-229ORDER. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 06/22/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1) (Entered: 06/22/2023)
2023-07-0710ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen) (alns). (Entered: 07/07/2023)
2023-07-1211NOTICE And Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/12/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns) (Entered: 07/13/2023)
2023-08-1112JOINT REPORT OF Rule 26(f) Conference, Discovery Plan, And Proposed Schedule(alns) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-1613Correspondence by Jonathan Cohen (aas) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-1814Minute Order re proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) held on 8/18/2023. Case did not settle. A continued ENE to be held by video is hereby set for 9/8/2023, at 9:30 AM before Judge Burkhardt. Any supplemental ENE statements shall be lodged by 9/5/2023 . In the event the case does not settle at the continued ENE, a Case Management Conference will be held at the conclusion of the ENE. (Defendant Attorney Glen Dorgan).(Jonathan Cohen, Sarah Leavitt). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (cxe) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-0815Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Continued Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/8/2023. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference also held on 9/8/2023. Order to follow. (Defendant Attorney Glen Dorgan). (Jonathan Cohen (Pro Se Plaintiff), Sarah Leavitt).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (cxe) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-0816SCHEDULING ORDER:Regulating Discovery And Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/8/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-1817NOTICE of Motion For Consolidation by Jonathan Cohen (alns) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-2618MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proof of Service)(Dorgan, Glen) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar