Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHonolulu Civil Beat Inc. v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictDistrict of Hawaii
CityHawaii
Case Number1:2023cv00216
Date Filed2023-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
PlaintiffHonolulu Civil Beat Inc.
Case DescriptionHonolulu Civil Beat submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning criminal charges brought against Ty J.K. Cullen from September 2014 to February 15, 2022. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI denied the request under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Civil Beat filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the FBI's denial. Civil Beat submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records on the investigation of former State Senator Jamie Kalani English for accepting a bribe. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request but denied it under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C). Civil Beat filed an administrative appeal to OIP. OIP upheld the agency's denial. Civil Beat then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-05-181COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2843270.), filed by Honolulu Civil Beat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-182NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00216 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-183Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/17/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/18/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-184CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: # 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, # 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jni) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-185Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honolulu Civil Beat Inc.. (Black, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-186Summons (Proposed) (Black, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-187Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jni) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-198ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/19/2023. Case reassigned to JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 23-00216 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar