Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBasey v. Reardon et al
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2023cv00124
Date Filed2023-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJoshua M. Kindred
PlaintiffKaleb Lee Basey
Case DescriptionKaleb Basey, a federal prisoner convicted of possessing online pornography, submitted two FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning his conviction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Basey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees

DefendantKyle Frederick Reardon in his official capacity
DefendantJolene Goeden in her official capacity
DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantExec. Office for the U.S. Attny's
DefendantFed. Bureau of Inv.
DefendantU.S. Dep't of Justice
DefendantFBI Field Office of Anchorage, Alaska
DefendantU.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Alaska
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-06-081COMPLAINT against Exec. Office for the U.S. Attny's, FBI Field Office of Anchorage, Alaska, Fed. Bureau of Inv., Jolene Goeden, Kyle Frederick Reardon, U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Alaska, U.S. Dep't of Justice, United States of America (Filing fee $402/Receipt #100020251), filed by Kaleb Lee Basey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2023)
2023-06-082Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2023)
2023-06-083MOTION to File Exhibits G&H Under Seal by Kaleb Lee Basey.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2023)
2023-06-085Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Kyle Federick Reardon, # 3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Jolene Goeden, # 4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Monty Wilkinson, Director of EOUSA, # 5 Unissued Summons re Defendant FBI Field Office, # 6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Christopher Wray, Director of FBI Anchorage)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2023)
2023-06-236Unissued summons re Defendant Wray, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wilkinson, # 2 Notice)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2023)
2023-08-077STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS CASES FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED PRISONERS Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 8/7/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar