Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01929
Date Filed2023-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning sent to, from, or including John Kirby, former Pentagon Press Secretary, with the words Afghanistan of Afghan and a list of keywords for search purposes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10179896) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/03/2023)
2023-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrtw) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-053STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 5, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-08-254ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before September 15, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 25, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2023. (smc) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-09-155Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 31, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 15, 2023. (lcdlf3). (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-10-316Joint STATUS REPORT by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the Court orders that the parties shall file another status report on or before January 17, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 31, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/17/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2024-01-177Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court orders the parties to file another joint status report on or before March 20, 2024. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 18, 2024. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/20/2024 (zjch, ) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar