Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01935
Date Filed2023-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBLOOMBERG L.P.
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Housing Finance Agency for records concerning the failure of Silicon Valley Bank and Signature Bank. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-051COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10181454) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BLOOMBERG L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-052NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BLOOMBERG L.P., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-053LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BLOOMBERG L.P. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-054SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 07/06/2023)
2023-07-065SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 07/06/2023)
2023-08-026Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-03MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint on or before September 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/3/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/03/2023)
2023-09-077ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/7/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-218Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by October 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/21/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-10-239Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-10-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-11-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BLOOMBERG L.P., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-1611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by BLOOMBERG L.P., JASON LEOPOLD. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 29, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by BLOOMBERG L.P., JASON LEOPOLD. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11-30-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2024-01-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1-4-2024. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-02-0514Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2-6-2024. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/06/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar