Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10186758) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL, CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Defendant, # 5 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons Attorney General)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Creighton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Raul A. Pinto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10188062. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 6 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-24 | 7 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL, CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) Modified on 7/26/2023 (ztth). (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-07-26 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 7 Certificate of Service. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. The correct event is under "Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed." Please refile. (ztth) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW served on 7/17/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) Modified party served on 7/31/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/17/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/17/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/16/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Raul A. Pinto is admitted to represent Plaintiffs AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL and CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/2/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before September 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/14/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-08-28 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Raul A. Pinto on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pinto, Raul) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 13 | ANSWER to Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before September 29, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/15/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Answer to Complaint) by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Attachments: # 1 Redlined version of Amended Answer)(Simon, Jeremy); Modified text at the request of counsel on 9/28/2023 (ztth). (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/29/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-19 | 16 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. Attorney Emily Creighton terminated. (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 10/19/2023) |
2023-11-15 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 13, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/15/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |