Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2023cv03450
Date Filed2023-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
also known as ACLU
Case DescriptionACLU submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the legal library materials provided in electronic form at all ICE facilities. The ACLU also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted the ACLU's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
also known as ICE
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
also known as DHS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-111COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union. Filing Fee $402.00 Paid. Receipt Number ACANDC-18437870. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-H, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Virgien, Kyle) (Filed on 7/11/2023) Modified on 7/13/2023 (mbc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-112Proposed Summons. (Virgien, Kyle) (Filed on 7/11/2023) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-113Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union identifying Other Affiliate American Civil Liberties Union Foundation for American Civil Liberties Union. (Virgien, Kyle) (Filed on 7/11/2023) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-114NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle A. Virgien (Virgien, Kyle) (Filed on 7/11/2023) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-115Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-116MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18438204.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Cho, Eunice) (Filed on 7/11/2023) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-127ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Eunice H. Cho's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-07-138Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023) (Entered: 07/13/2023)
2023-07-139Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023) (Entered: 07/13/2023)
2023-07-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Marisol Dominguez-Ruiz (Dominguez-Ruiz, Marisol) (Filed on 7/18/2023) (Entered: 07/18/2023)
2023-07-3111CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms . Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2023) (Entered: 07/31/2023)
2023-08-0212CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union.. (Virgien, Kyle) (Filed on 8/2/2023) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-2513STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 8/25/2023) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-09-0514CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms . Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2023) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-1315ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1316CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1917ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dominguez-Ruiz, Marisol) (Filed on 9/19/2023) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-2718ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (DeVito, David) (Filed on 9/27/2023) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
2023-10-1119JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Dominguez-Ruiz, Marisol) (Filed on 10/11/2023) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-1320CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference is set for 10/18/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
2023-10-1821Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2023 by Zoom Videoconference. CASE REFERRED to a randomly-assigned Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference which shall be completed within 120 days. Updated joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 12/13/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Digital Recording Time: Zoom Webinar Time 1:56-2:12. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-1922CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-2023CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: This case was referred for a settlement conference to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court sets a call with the parties to discuss the timing and logistics of the settlement conference for 11/2/2023 at 11:30 AM . The court will email a call-in number separately. If this date does not work, parties may request to change the date by stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-2324CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the court resets the Settlement Conference Scheduling Call from 11/2/2023 to 11/9/2023 at 11:30 AM . The court will email the call-in information separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-11-0625CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL TIME: Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 11:30 AM is reset to 12:30 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. The call-in information remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023) (Entered: 11/06/2023)
2023-11-0926Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference Scheduling Call held on 11/9/2023. The court sets the Settlement Conference for Wednesday, February 28, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Not Reported). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2023) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-0927Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Settlement Conference Statements due 2/21/2024. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/09/2023. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-0928CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference previously set for 2/28/2024 is reset to 3/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Settlement Conference Statements due 3/20/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar