Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANIMAL PARTISAN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01990
Date Filed2023-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffANIMAL PARTISAN
Case DescriptionAnimal Partisan submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning two conferences NAMI's 2020 and 2022 Animal Care and Handling Conferences. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Animal Partisan that it could find no responsive records. Animal Partisan filed another FOIA request for the records. This time the FBI denied disclosure under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Animal Partisan filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The Office of Information Policy upheld the FBI's denial and Animal Partisan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-111COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10196338) filed by ANIMAL PARTISAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FBI, # 3 Summons USAO-DC, # 4 Summons USAG, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-07-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-07-173ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/17/23. (DM) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-08-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/19/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/19/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/19/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/18/2023.) (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-185ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-226ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before September 15, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 22, 2023. (lcsk) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2023. (dot) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-09-157Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-18MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 27, 2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every ninety days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 18, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
2023-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every ninety days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
2023-11-278Joint STATUS REPORT by ANIMAL PARTISAN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar