Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10207980) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - HHS GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-17 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrtw) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 5 | Counter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before September 19, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/17/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-09-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/19/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/3/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/21/2023 (tj) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 19, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/22/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |