Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTepe v. Corker et al
DistrictWestern District of North Carolina
CityCharlotte
Case Number3:2023cv00423
Date Filed2023-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior District Judg Robert J. Conrad, Jr
PlaintiffMawule Tepe
Case DescriptionMawule Tepe filed suit against the district court. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantClifton L. Corker in his Hon. U.S. District Judge and personal positions
DefendantTravis R. McDonough in his Hon. U.S. Chief District Judge and personal positions
DefendantKatherine A. Crytzer in her Hon. U.S. District Judge and personal positions
DefendantCurtis L. Collier in his Hon. U.S. District Judge and personal positions
DefendantSusan K. Lee in her Hon. U.S. Magistrate Judge and personal positions
DefendantChristopher H. Steger in his Hon. U.S. District Judge and personal positions
DefendantDanny J. Boggs in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantRichard Allen Griffin in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantAndre B. Mathis in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit District Judge and personal positions
DefendantJohn K. Bush in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantEric E. Murphy in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantEric L. Clay in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantDavid W. McKeague in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantJohn B. Nalbandian in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantRonald Lee Gilman in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantJulia Smith Gibbons in her Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantChad A. Readler in his Hon. U.S. Sixth Circuit Judge and personal positions
DefendantDeborah S. Hunt in her Sixth Circuit Clerk's and personal positions
DefendantMonica M. Page in her Sixth Circuit Clerk's and personal positions
DefendantParis LaRon Robinson in his Sixth Circuit Clerk's and personal positions
DefendantMichelle Lambert in her Sixth Circuit Clerk's and personal positions
DefendantLeAnna Wilson in her District Court Clerk's and personal positions
DefendantU.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
DefendantU.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
DefendantState of Tennessee
DefendantState of Ohio
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantUnited States
DefendantLucille Lattimore Nelson Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Law Firm, in her personal and Attorney position
DefendantWilliam Stewart Rutchow Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Law Firm, in his personal and Attorney position
DefendantOgletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart P.C. Law Firm
DefendantEmily Louise Nenni Attorney at Javitch Block LLC, in her personal and Attorney position
DefendantMichael David Slodov Attorney at Javitch Block LLC, in his personal and Attorney position
DefendantJavitch Block LLC
DefendantFrankie Neil Spero Attorney at Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP, in his personal and Attorney capacity
DefendantBradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP Law Firm
DefendantDerek Wayne Mullins Attorney at Baker Donelson Law Firm, in his Attorney and personal position
DefendantJustin Michael Sveadas Attorney at Baker Donelson Law Firm, in his Attorney and personal position
DefendantBaker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C. Law Firm
DefendantBank of America
DefendantTruist Financial Corporation
DefendantWhirlpool Corporation
DefendantMichael D. Ray
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [45]
Opinion/Order [46]
Opinion/Order [49]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-141Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4670), filed by Mawule Tepe. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(tlj) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-142Summons Issued Conventionally as to Danny J. Boggs, John K. Bush, Eric L. Clay, Curtis L. Collier, Clifton L. Corker, Katherine A. Crytzer, Department of Justice, Julia Smith Gibbons, Ronald Lee Gilman, Richard Allen Griffin, Deborah S. Hunt, Michelle Lambert, Susan K. Lee, Andre B. Mathis, Travis R. McDonough, David W. McKeague, Eric E. Murphy, John B. Nalbandian, Monica M. Page, Chad A. Readler, Paris LaRon Robinson, Christopher H. Steger, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, United States, LeAnna Wilson, and US Attorney General. (tlj) Modified docket text on 7/17/2023 (tlj). (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-143Summons Issued Conventionally as to Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., Bank of America, Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP, Javitch Block LLC, Derek Wayne Mullins, Lucille Lattimore Nelson, Emily Louise Nenni, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart P.C., William Stewart Rutchow, Michael David Slodov, Frankie Neil Spero, State of Ohio, State of Tennessee, Justin Michael Sveadas, Truist Financial Corporation, Whirlpool Corporation. (tlj) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-17Clerk's Entry and Service of Case Assignment Packet . The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-284MOTION to Dismiss by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. Responses due by 8/11/2023 (Nenni, Emily). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 07/28/2023)
2023-07-285MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Docket report 1:21-cv-0040, # 2 Exhibit Docket report 1:22-cv-0111, # 3 Exhibit Docket report 1:222-cv-0264, # 4 Exhibit Docket report 1:22-cv-0275, # 5 Exhibit Order, # 6 Exhibit Order, # 7 Exhibit Order, # 8 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 9 Exhibit Docket report 1:21-cv-0040, # 10 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, # 11 Exhibit Docket report 22-5652, # 12 Exhibit Order 22-5652, # 13 Exhibit Docket report 22-111, # 14 Exhibit Docket report 22-264, # 15 Exhibit Docket report 22-5649, # 16 Exhibit Docket report 22-5882, # 17 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, # 18 Exhibit Docket report 22-264, # 19 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, # 20 Exhibit Docket report 22-275, # 21 Exhibit Complaint 1:22-cv-0275, # 22 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, # 23 Exhibit Docket report 22-5649, # 24 Exhibit Docket report 22-5652, # 25 Exhibit Docket report 22-5188)(Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 07/28/2023)
2023-08-046Pro Se MOTION to Challenge the Qualification of Attorney Emily Louise Nenni, MOTION to Strike 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 8/18/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Cover Letter, # 5 Envelope) (ef). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/04/2023)
2023-08-047ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 8/18/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/4/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 08/04/2023)
2023-08-078MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by State of Ohio. (Thurman, Frederick). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-089ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. State of Ohio answer due 9/6/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/8/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-0810RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Challenge the Qualification of Attorney Emily Louise Nenni re 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. Replies due by 8/15/2023 (Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-0911Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re: 1 Complaint by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 8/23/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (tlj). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-0912SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mawule Tepe. State of Ohio served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/6/2023; State of Tennessee served on 7/24/2023, answer due 8/14/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(tlj) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-0913SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mawule Tepe. Danny J. Boggs served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; John K. Bush served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Eric L. Clay served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Curtis L. Collier served on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; Clifton L. Corker served on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; Katherine A. Crytzer served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Department of Justice served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023; Julia Smith Gibbons served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Ronald Lee Gilman served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Richard Allen Griffin served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Deborah S. Hunt served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Michelle Lambert served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Susan K. Lee served on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; Andre B. Mathis served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Travis R. McDonough served on 7/28/2023, answer due 9/26/2023; David W. McKeague served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Eric E. Murphy served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; John B. Nalbandian served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Monica M. Page served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Chad A. Readler served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Paris LaRon Robinson served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; Christopher H. Steger served on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/25/2023; U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee served on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/25/2023; United States served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023; LeAnna Wilson served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope)(tlj) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-1114ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re: 1 Complaint.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/10/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-1115Pro Se REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Challenge the Qualification of Attorney Emily Louise Nenni re 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mawule Tepe. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(tlj) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-1817Pro Se MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 9/1/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope) (cjs). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-2218RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Leave to File by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. Replies due by 8/29/2023 (Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-2219MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Leave to File by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. Replies due by 8/29/2023 (Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-2220Notice of Withdrawal of document by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov ***Documents terminated: 19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Michael David Slodov, Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni. (Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-2221SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mawule Tepe. Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C. served on 8/8/2023, answer due 8/29/2023; Bank of America served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023; Javitch Block LLC served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023; Derek Wayne Mullins served on 8/8/2023, answer due 8/29/2023; Lucille Lattimore Nelson served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; Emily Louise Nenni served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023; Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart P.C. served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; William Stewart Rutchow served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; Michael David Slodov served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023; Justin Michael Sveadas served on 8/8/2023, answer due 8/29/2023; Truist Financial Corporation served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tlj) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-2322ORDER denying 17 pro se Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint or Response due by 9/1/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/23/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2023. Responses due by 9/1/2023 (mga) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-2523NOTICE of Appearance by Jill C. Walters on behalf of Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., Derek Wayne Mullins, Justin Michael Sveadas, Truist Financial Corporation (Walters, Jill) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-2524MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., Derek Wayne Mullins, Justin Michael Sveadas, Truist Financial Corporation. (Walters, Jill). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-2525ORDER granting 24 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re re: 1 Complaint. Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C. answer due 9/29/2023; Derek Wayne Mullins answer due 9/29/2023; Justin Michael Sveadas answer due 9/29/2023; Truist Financial Corporation answer due 9/29/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/25/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-2826NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reed Marcus on behalf of Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP, Frankie Neil Spero (Marcus, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2827MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP, Frankie Neil Spero. (Marcus, Robert). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2828ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint . Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP and Frankie Neil Spero answers due 9/27/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/28/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2929NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Ray on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C., William Stewart Rutchow, and Lucille Lattimore Nelson (Ray, Michael) Modified text and filers on 9/6/2023 (brl). (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-2930Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.. (Ray, Michael) Modified text & filer on 9/6/2023 (brl). (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-2931Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation (Ray, Michael) Modified text & filer on 9/6/2023 (brl). (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-2932MOTION to Dismiss by Lucille Lattimore Nelson, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart P.C., William Stewart Rutchow, Whirlpool Corporation. Responses due by 9/12/2023 (Ray, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-2933MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss by Lucille Lattimore Nelson, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart P.C., William Stewart Rutchow, Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Cover Sheet, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Cover Sheet, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Cover Sheet, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Cover Sheet, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Cover Sheet, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Cover Sheet, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Cover Sheet, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Cover Sheet, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Cover Sheet, # 24 Exhibit)(Ray, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-3034ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/12/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/29/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-09-0535NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya L. Urps on behalf of Bank of America (Urps, Tonya) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-0536Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America. (Urps, Tonya) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-0537MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America. Responses due by 9/19/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum) (Urps, Tonya). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-0540Pro Se Notice to Court and MOTION to Challenge the Jurisdiction of the Court when the Process Services are not yet completed by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 9/19/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Cover Letter, # 7 Envelope) (ef). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-0541Pro Se MOTION for an Order of Prohibition against the Law Firm Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., Pro Se MOTION to Strike 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 9/19/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (ef). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-0542SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mawule Tepe. Whirlpool Corporation served on 8/8/2023, answer due 8/29/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ef) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-0638ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 9/19/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/6/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-0639ANSWER to 1 Complaint by State of Ohio.(Thurman, Frederick) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-0743Certified Mail Receipt 7003 1010 0003 5291 1016 addressed to Mawule Tepe delivered 9/1/2023(mga) Modified to correct file date on 9/8/2023 (mga). (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-0844ORDER denying 40 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion To Challenge Jurisdiction Of This Court When The Process Services Are Not Yet Completed. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/8/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-0845ORDER denying 41 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion For An Order Of Prohibition Against The Law Firm Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., And Motion To Strike Defendants Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz P.C., Derek Wayne Mullins, Justin Michael Sveadas, Truist Financial Corporation's Motion For Time Extension re: 1 Complaint . Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/8/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-1146ORDER denying 6 pro se Plaintiff's Motion to Challenge the Qualification of Attorney Emily Louise Nenni and MOTION to Strike Defendants Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov's 4 and 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-1347SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mawule Tepe. Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023; Frankie Neil Spero served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(cjs) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1348Pro Se MOTION to Compel the Defendant Emily Louise Nenni to Respond to Interrogatories and Request for Production, and Objection to Court Orders re 7 ROSEBORO ORDER, MOTION to Set a Hearing on This Motion to Compel and Motion for Disqualification, MOTION to Strike re 6 Pro Se MOTION to Challenge the Qualification of Attorney Emily Louise by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 9/27/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (cjs). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1349ORDER denying 48 pro se Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Motion for Hearing; Motion to Strike. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/13/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1450Pro Se NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 38 Order Setting Response Deadline, 22 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 7 Order Setting Response Deadline, 34 Order Setting Response Deadline, 46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike,, 45 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike,, 44 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Mawule Tepe. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 5694. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(tlj) Modified file date on 9/15/2023 (tlj). (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1452Pro Se MOTION to Challenge the Qualification of Michael D. Ray, Jill C. Walters, Tonya L. Urps, and Robert Reed Marcus Pursuant to the Local Rule LCvR 83.1 by Mawule Tepe. Responses due by 9/28/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope) (tlj). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1453Pro Se MOTION for Entry of Default by Mawule Tepe. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope) (tlj) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1551Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 50 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, (tlj) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1554MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal as Frivolous and to Retain Jurisdiction re 50 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. Responses due by 9/29/2023 (Nenni, Emily). Modified to remove referral on 9/15/2023 (mga). (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1555MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal as Frivolous and to Retain Jurisdiction re 50 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, by Javitch Block LLC, Emily Louise Nenni, Michael David Slodov. (Nenni, Emily) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-1556MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Danny J. Boggs, John K. Bush, Eric L. Clay, Curtis L. Collier, Clifton L. Corker, Katherine A. Crytzer, Department of Justice, Julia Smith Gibbons, Ronald Lee Gilman, Richard Allen Griffin, Deborah S. Hunt, Michelle Lambert, Susan K. Lee, Andre B. Mathis, Travis R. McDonough, David W. McKeague, Eric E. Murphy, John B. Nalbandian, Monica M. Page, Chad A. Readler, Paris LaRon Robinson, Christopher H. Steger, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, United States, LeAnna Wilson. (Gatehouse, James). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar