Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE v. NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02046
Date Filed2023-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Loren L. AliKhan
PlaintiffCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionThe Chinese American Legal Defense Alliance submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning investigations against any professors at a U.S. university concerning a long list of topics. CALDA also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after the agency failed to respond completely to the request, CALDA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-171COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10210159) filed by CHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons NIH, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO-DC, # 5 Exhibit 101, # 6 Exhibit 102, # 7 Exhibit 103, # 8 Exhibit 104)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-17Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-08-153NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH served on 8/15/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/24/23., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2023.) (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-215Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have through and including September 22, 2023, to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/22/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-09-196MOTION for Order for Leave to Amended Complaint by CHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 7(m) Certification, # 2 Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 101, # 4 Exhibit 102, # 5 Exhibit 103, # 6 Exhibit 104, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-20MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is granted. The operative Complaint shall be the amended pleading at ECF No. 6-2. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/20/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-297ANSWER to Complaint (ECF No. 6-2) by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-10-028ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 16, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/02/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-169Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 18, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/17/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-12-18Case directly reassigned to Judge Loren L. Alikhan. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a status report on or before February 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 12/21/2023. (lclla2) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-02-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-02-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 02/16/2024. (lclla2) (Entered: 02/16/2024)
2024-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/19/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar