Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAland v. U.S Department of the Interior, et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2023cv04599
Date Filed2023-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable LaShonda A. Hunt
PlaintiffRobert H. Aland
Case DescriptionRobert Aland submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning Greg Sheehan and Martha Williams, senior officials in the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided some responsive records but after the agency failed to respond completely, Aland filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S Department of the Interior
DefendantU.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-171COMPLAINT filed by Robert H. Aland. (Exhibits) (rc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-172CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-173PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Robert H. Aland. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-175SUMMONS Issued as to U.S Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (rc, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2023: # 1 (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-17CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-17CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-07-206MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge LaShonda A. Hunt. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Initial Status Report for New Case by 10/3/23. A template for the report can be found on Judge Hunt's webpage on the Court's website under "New and Reassigned Cases." A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 10/10/23, at 10:00 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2023)
2023-08-047Entered in Error. (rc, ) Modified on 8/10/2023 (rc, ). (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-049AFFIDAVIT PROVING SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert H. Aland as to U.S Department of the Interior served on 7/17/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service served on 7/17/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Attachments) (Received for Docketing 08/09/20233) (rc, ) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-108NOTICE of Correction regarding summons issued,, summons issued as to USA, 7 . (rc, ) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-1610DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S Department of the Interior (Terman, Sarah) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-1611ANSWER to Complaint by U.S Department of the Interior(Terman, Sarah) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-09-2712MOTION by Plaintiff Robert H. Aland(1) more definite statement; (2) Adequate searces; , (3) limited discovery, (4) Vaughn Index; (5) in camera review; and , (6) records production. (Exhibits) (rc, ) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-2913MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's motion (1) more definite statement; (2) Adequate searches; (3) limited discovery; (4) Vaughn Index; (5) in camera review; and (6) records production 12 will be heard at the initial status hearing currently set for 10/10/23. The initial status report date of 10/3/23 remains set. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-10-0314STATUS Report (Joint) by U.S Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service (Terman, Sarah) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-0615MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's motion (1) more definite statement; (2) Adequate searches; (3) limited discovery; (4) Vaughn Index; (5) in camera review; and (6) records production 12 and the initial status set for 10/10/23 at 10:00 AM is reset to 10/10/23 at 9:45 AM. Time change only. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-1016MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Motion hearing held telephonically. For all the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for (1) a More Definite Statement 1 ; (2) Adequate searches; (3) limited discovery; (4) Vaughn Index; (5) in camera review; and (6) records production 12 is denied without prejudice. By 10/20/23, parties are directed to meet and confer on 1) the administrative appeal process; 2) scope and topics of discovery sought in this lawsuit; 3) whether the government agrees to voluntarily provide the information the plaintiff; 4) any other case-management or scheduling issues the parties wish to raise, and file a joint status report. The Court will set further dates after reviewing the parties' submission. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-1917STATUS Report (Joint) by U.S Department of the Interior (Terman, Sarah) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-2018MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report 17 . A telephonic status hearing is set for 10/31/23, at 10:30 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-3019MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Due to an unanticipated scheduling conflict, the Court must reset the telephonic hearing currently scheduled for 10/31/23, to 11/9/23, at 10:00 AM. The Court apologizes to the parties and their attorneys for any inconvenience. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-11-0920MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Motion hearing held telephonically. Briefing schedule on the anticipated motion for summary judgment is as follows: Defendants' brief and supporting materials are due by 12/11/23. Plaintiff's oral request to respond within seven days is permitted; Plaintiff's response brief in opposition and supporting materials are due by 12/18/23. Defendants' reply brief and supporting materials are due by 1/16/24. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar