Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UR M. JADDOU ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10212839) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to USCIS, # 3 Summons to Graves, # 4 Summons to Garland)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zljn) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-18 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-25 | 3 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/25/23. (DM) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/27/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/26/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to Proof of Service)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-08-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Due to increased caseloads at the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia, Defendant requests an extension of time, from August 20, 2023 to October 20, 2023, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff consents only to a thirty-day extension. Because Plaintiff would suffer no prejudice as a result of a sixty-day extension, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED over Plaintiff's partial opposition. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 20, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 15, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/15/2023) |
2023-08-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/20/2023. (dot) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 8 | ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report on or before November 17, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 20, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2023. (dot) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-17 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |