Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against THE ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE, THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10215301) filed by RICHARD USHER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons as to Assistant Attorney General for the Antitrust Division of the United States Department of Justice, # 5 Summons as to United States Department of Justice, # 6 Summons as to Merrick Garland, # 7 Summons as to Laura Starling, # 8 Summons as to Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C.)(Gidley, John) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-18 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RICHARD USHER. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-00654-JMC. (Gidley, John) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-07-19 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zljn) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-19 | 3 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/26/2023. (Gidley, John) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/26/2023; UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 7/26/2023; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/26/2023. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2023-08-02 | 6 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael David Kendall, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249131. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD USHER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael David Kendall in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John) Modified on 8/7/2023 (zed). (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-08-02 | 7 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Kelly Newman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249165. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD USHER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Kelly Newman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John) Modified on 8/7/2023 (zed). (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-08-03 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Kelly Newman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249165. Fee Status: Fee Paid., 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael David Kendall, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249131. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. The following error(s) need correction: Declaration must have an original, ink signature. Please refile using the event Declaration. (mg) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-07 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/07/2023.....MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael David Kendall is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 7, 2023. (lcjmc2) Modified on 8/7/2023 (zed). (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-08-07 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/07/2023.....MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney C. Kelly Newman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 7, 2023. (lcjmc2) Modified on 8/7/2023 (zed). (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-08-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Notice of Error dated August 3, 2023, it is hereby ORDERED that the Minute Orders of August 7, 2023, granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are VACATED. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 7, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 8 | DECLARATION of Michael David Kendall by RICHARD USHER re 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael David Kendall, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249131. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. (Gidley, John) (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 9 | DECLARATION of C. Kelly Newman by RICHARD USHER re 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Kelly Newman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10249165. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. (Gidley, John) (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael David Kendall is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 11, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney C. Kelly Newman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 11, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Kendall on behalf of RICHARD USHER (Kendall, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly C. Newman on behalf of RICHARD USHER (Newman, Kelly) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of the Motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants will respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 17, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, John) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 15 | ANSWER to Complaint by ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by September 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 11, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/25/2023. (zgf) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE ANTITRUST DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Robinson, John) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 17 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel E. Medici, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10384472. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RICHARD USHER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel E. Medici in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER setting Status Conference: Having considered the Parties' scheduling dispute described in their 16 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the Parties appear for a status conference on on October 3, 2023 at 1:30 PM. The conference will be on the record before Judge Cobb and conducted via Zoom. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the information necessary to access the video conference. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 29, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Attorney Daniel E. Medici is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 29, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-02 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Medici on behalf of RICHARD USHER (Medici, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
2023-10-03 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jia M. Cobb: Status Conference held on 10/3/2023. Scheduling Order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman) (zgf) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 19 | ORDER: Having reviewed the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, and in consideration of the Parties' arguments today in the Zoom status conference on the record before the Court, the Court hereby ORDERS the Parties to comply with the deadlines for document disclosure, motions, and hearings as detailed in the accompanying order. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 3, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |