Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNIGAM v. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02092
Date Filed2023-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffSHIVANGI RISHI NIGAM
Case DescriptionShivangi Rishi Nigam submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the denial of his visa application. He heard nothing from CBP. He then submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for the same type of records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After receiving no response from the agency, Nigam filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-191COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10216294) filed by SHIVANGI RISHI NIGAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons As to CBP, # 6 Summons As to USAG, # 7 Summons As to USCIS, # 8 Summons As to USAO)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 07/19/2023)
2023-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zcb) (Entered: 07/19/2023)
2023-07-192SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/19/2023)
2023-07-193ERRATA of Summons to AUSA by SHIVANGI RISHI NIGAM re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA. (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 07/19/2023)
2023-08-294Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 4 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. Upon consideration of the parties' 4 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case is STAYED until October 30, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, by October 30, 2023, a joint status report, unless Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed the case before then. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/30/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-30Case Stayed. (zkh) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-10-305Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-10-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by December 29, 2023, a further joint status report, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/31/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-11-026NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-12-297Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2024-01-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by February 27, 2024, a further joint status report, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/3/2024. (lctjk3) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-258NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION Substituting for attorney John Moustakas (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-02-279Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION. (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 02/27/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar